Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mukai, Jeffery, against Tran, Albert Kien, Tran, Joanne Tu, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2017 |
Category(09) Limited Other Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions265 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time265 days |
Judgment
Date: August 30, 2018Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: July 20, 2020Complaint
Date: December 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
August 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Stipulation FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SERVED ON JOA Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, SERVED ON JOANNE TU TRAN, CO-RESIDENT |
|
January 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAIN, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAIN, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued / Filed | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.