Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sfm-6 Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Carruthers, D. Scott, against Bradley, Felicia, Does 1 Through 10, represented by Michel, James A, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with George A. Miram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge A. Miram Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Memorandum to Set Civil Action for Court Trial
Date: December 19, 2017Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Declaration
Date: December 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Arbitration Conference
Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Stay 02/23/2018 Motion to Stay Judge: Buchwald, Gerald J. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING DECISION BY CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT · GRANTED. Defendant Felicia Bradley’s unopposed Motion To Stay Action is Granted. See Landis v. North American Co.(1936)...
Judge: GERALD J. BUCHWALD |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pre-Arbitration Conference
Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing re RE: PRE-ARBITRATION HEARING Notice of Hearing re RE: PRE-ARBITRATION HEARING |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF JAMES MICHEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING DECISION BY CALIFORNIA SUPRE Declaration OF JAMES MICHEL IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING DECISION BY CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING DECISION BY CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT Motion AND MOTION TO STAY ACTION PENDING DECISION BY CALIFORNIA SUPREME COURT |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Posting Jury Fees | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Advanced Jury Fee Defendant Non-Refundable |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.