Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bayrich Development Usa Llc, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Pollak, Corey M., against Does 3 Through 10, Marsh, Fiona, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Gerald J. Buchwald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald J. Buchwald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Motion
Date: December 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 02/21/2018 Motion to Compel Judge: Buchwald, Gerald J. |
|
February 21, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
PLAINTIFF’S MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMNET OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR · OFF-CALENDAR. The Court is in receipt of an email from Petitioner’s Counsel, dated Feb. 14, 2018, stating that he h...
Judge: GERALD J. BUCHWALD |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRAITOIN, ETC Motion FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRAITOIN, ETC |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Received | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATION Notice OF MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATION |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF JEFFREY LIN IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT Declaration OF JEFFREY LIN IN SUPPORT OF VERIFIED PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND FOR APPOINTMENT OF NEUTRAL ARBITRATOR |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.