Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Grundon, Bryan M, against Does 1 Through 5, Garcia, James F., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management126 days |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
Category(09) Unlimited Other Collections |
Time To Trial251 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions272 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time435 days |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Date: September 25, 2018Complaint
Date: December 27, 2017Request For Dismissal
Date: March 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Type: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND ENTER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ORDER TH Order Type: APPLICATION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND ENTER STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT; ORDER THEREON Signed by: V. RAYMOND SWOPE Date Signed: 3/7/2019 |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 23; STIPULATED JUDGMENT Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 23; STIPULATED JUDGMENT |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action 09/25/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
September 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Case dismissed | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Court Trial 09/04/2018 COURT TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 1/2 DAY Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Trial | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Case Management Conference 05/02/2018 Case Management Conference Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Proof of Service by MAIL of CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Not Entered DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER ON 03/19/2018 Request for Entry of Default Not Entered DEFENDANT FILED AN ANSWER ON 03/19/2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.