Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Litco, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hicks, Reda M, against Hayden, Sheerin, Hayden, Timothy, Windward Hotel Management, Llc, represented by Hagan, David L., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert D. Foiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management131 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time116 days |
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 10, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: April 17, 2018Ex Parte Application For Extension of Time
Date: February 27, 2018Complaint
Date: December 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL, NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL |
|
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Entry of Default Not Entered PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 03/22/2018 QUESTIONABLE AS RECIPIENT Request for Entry of Default Not Entered PROOF OF SERVICE FILED 03/22/2018 QUESTIONABLE AS RECIPIENT WAS NOT SPECIFIED ON WHAT CAPACITY ON OF COMPANY HE WAS SERVED. |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Answer (Unlimited) Answer Answer (Unlimited) Answer |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT, SHEERIN HAYDEN served on NICHOLAS J. S Proof of Service by MAIL of ANSWER TO COMPLAINT BY DEFENDANT, SHEERIN HAYDEN served on NICHOLAS J. SCOTT, SCOTT LAW GROUP |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of (QUESTIONABLE PROOF OF SERVICE AS NAMED RECIPIE Proof of Service by MAIL & ACKNOWLEDGMENT SERVICE of (QUESTIONABLE PROOF OF SERVICE AS NAMED RECIPIENT WAS NOT SPECIFIED ON WHAT CAPACITY ON BEHALF OF COMPANY HE WAS SERVED SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ) |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET S Proof of Service by SUBSTITUTED SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET SERVED ON MICHAEL DOE, FRONT DESK |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOT Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, CASE MANGEMENT STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.