Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mann, Arashpreet, filed a(n) (43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) case in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan I. Etezadi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
Category(43) Unlimited Other Petition (Not Spec) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time49 days |
Order to Show Cause Change of Name
Date: December 29, 2017Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name
Date: February 09, 2018Petition for Name Change
Date: December 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name 02/09/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Change of Name Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADIDate Signed: 02/09/18New Name: ARASHH Decree Changing Name and/or Gender Signed By: JUDGE ETEZADI Date Signed: 02/09/18 New Name: ARASHH SINGH MANN |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Publication re: Name Change | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Change of Name | |
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Name Change | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer 18. NAME CHANGE |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Petition for Name Change | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.