Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Chiang, Jason, filed a(n) Business Governance - Securities case represented by Warhurst, William R., against Compass Management Group, Inc., A California Corporation, Ventana Del Mar Homeowners Association, A California Nonprofit Mutual Benefit Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Robert D. Foiles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert D. Foiles Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2017 |
Category(21) Unlimited Partnership And Corp Gov |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions153 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBusiness Governance |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time61 days |
Application
Date: June 04, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 04, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: June 19, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Request For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL Proof of Service by MAIL of REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing OSC RE DISMISSAL 1-29-19 Notice of Court Hearing OSC RE DISMISSAL 1-29-19 |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion for Reconsideration
Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Type: TO RE-SCHEDULE PENDING DATES (1) TO ANSWER THE PETITION AND (2) TO HEAR MO Stipulation & Order Type: TO RE-SCHEDULE PENDING DATES (1) TO ANSWER THE PETITION AND (2) TO HEAR MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ANTI-SLAPP RULING. Signed by: JUDGE AYOOB Date Signed: 06/14/18 |
|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order sent for signature to Judicial Officer #27 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO RE-SCHEDULE PENDING DATES. |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice OF ERRATA RE: RESPONDENTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S M Notice OF ERRATA RE: RESPONDENTS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 18, 2018 ORDER RE: SPEICAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND RESPONDENT'S DEMURRERES (CCP 1008) |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: RESPONDENTS VENTANA DEL MAR HOMEOWNERS Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of NOTICE OF ERRATA RE: RESPONDENTS VENTANA DEL MAR HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION AND COMPASS MANAGEMENT, INC'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURT'S MAY 18, 2018 ORDER RE: SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE AND RESPONDENT'S DEMURRERS served on WILLIAM R WARHURST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.