Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Monsarrat, Mark P., Redwood Shores Real Estate, Inc., Reynolds, Rob, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Warhurst, William R., against Bogart, Scott, Does 12 To 50, Does 1 To 50, Inclusive, Flor, Marvin, Redwood Shores Real Estate, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Levy, David M., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Ernst A. Halperin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeErnst A. Halperin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management308 days |
Filing DateJuly 12, 2017 |
Category(06) Unlimited Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
Time To Trial1049 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: April 09, 2019Declaration in Support
Date: November 12, 2020Notice
Date: November 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Halperin, Ernst A. |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice NOTICE OF LODGING ORIGINAL CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPTS RE: REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC . DB NOTICE OF LODGING ORIGINAL CERTIFIED RETURN RECEIPTS RE: REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC . DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES AND ROB REYNOLDS' APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT |
|
December 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment for All Purposes | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC. DBA REMAX STAR PRO Proposed Order Received (PROPOSED) ORDER GRANTING REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC. DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES AND ROB REYNOLDS' APPLICATON FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT (CCP SECTION 877.6(a)(2) FWD: TO DEPT. 4 |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF YVONNE V. JORGNESEN OF REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC. DBA REMAX STAR PRO Declaration in Support OF YVONNE V. JORGNESEN OF REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE, INC. DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES AND ROB REYNOLDS' APPLICATION FOR ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice OF SETTLEMENT Notice OF SETTLEMENT |
|
November 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC O Request For Dismissal With Prejudice AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC ON 11/08/18 |
|
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO R Request For Dismissal Partial (for multiple parties) With Prejudice- FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AS TO REDWOOD SHORES REAL ESTATE INC. DBA REMAX STAR PROPERTIES (AKA DOE 10) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.