Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Flores, Emilio Luna, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Khorsandi, Arash, against Koravitsyn, Yevgeniy, Korovitsyna, Esfir, Purcell, Doris, represented by Gray, Kevin J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Susan I. Etezadi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan I. Etezadi Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2017 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial495 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time490 days |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 01, 2018Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to
Date: October 03, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 03, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial estimate;10 days.
Judge: Etezadi, Susan I. |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Type: RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER ERSPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES Order Type: RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER ERSPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO, ETC Signed by: JUDGE DUBOIS Date Signed: 11/08/18 |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice Request For Dismissal With Prejudice |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Compel 11/08/2018 Motion to Compel Judge: DuBois, Richard H. |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Mandatory Settlement Conference 10/24/2018 Mandatory Settlement Conference Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
October 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FU Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to DEFENDANTS' AMENDED NOTICE OF MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO; AND MONETARY SANCTIONS REQUEST |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO; AND SANCTIONS REQUEST |
|
October 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF ALEXANDAR PROMM IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTI Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF ALEXANDAR PROMM IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET TWO; AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO; AND MONETARY SANCTIONS REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.