Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dabbagh, Ghassan, Dabbagh, Nour-Aldine Ghassan, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Simon, Juan M, against Does 1 - 10, Inclusive, Robins Wu Analytics Consulting, Inc., Wu, Robins Rueybin, represented by Kim, Christina E, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Jonathan E. Karesh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJonathan E. Karesh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management155 days |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2017 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial628 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time594 days |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: December 03, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: May 15, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: May 22, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: February 28, 2018Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: February 11, 2019Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: August 15, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: August 15, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: February 19, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 22, 2018Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR
Date: November 21, 2018Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR
Date: October 19, 2018Motion to Compel Further
Date: September 18, 2018Motion to Compel Further
Date: September 18, 2018Motion to Compel Further
Date: September 18, 2018Notice
Date: August 16, 2018Order to Show Cause
Date: August 01, 2018Complaint
Date: July 05, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: June 05, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 05, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: October 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 5 DAYS
Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Un-conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to ADR
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Proposed Order received & forwarded to Dept 11 STIP & ORDER TO ADR |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR 11/21/2018 Order to Show Cause Re: Failed to File Stip and Order to ADR Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mail returned undelivered AS TO REBECCA TURNERDocument: CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING Reason: RETURN T Mail returned undelivered AS TO REBECCA TURNER Document: CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING Reason: RETURN TO SENDER; NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED; UNABLE TO FORWARD. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.