Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Williams, Judy, Williams, Philip, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Carcione, Joseph W, Jr, against Azeem K. Lakha, D.M.D., Baird, Scott C., Does 1 Through 100, Lakha, Azeem K., represented by Finn, Peter F, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with John L. Grandsaert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn L. Grandsaert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management119 days |
Filing DateJuly 05, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial446 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time419 days |
Separate Statement
Date: April 12, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 07, 2017Declaration
Date: September 07, 2017Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: January 04, 2018Declaration
Date: December 05, 2017First Amended Complaint
Date: September 22, 2017Declaration
Date: May 16, 2018Declaration
Date: April 30, 2018Complaint
Date: July 05, 2017Separate Statement
Date: December 22, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 30, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: November 07, 2017Declaration
Date: May 22, 2018Request For Dismissal
Date: November 16, 2018Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case
Date: August 28, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: May 22, 2018Separate Statement
Date: April 30, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 30, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 12, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: January 08, 2018Declaration
Date: December 28, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: December 28, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: December 22, 2017Notice
Date: December 12, 2017Separate Statement
Date: December 05, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: December 05, 2017Motion
Date: December 05, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: November 09, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: September 29, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: September 07, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal of Entire Action
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION Request For Dismissal With Prejudice ENTIRE ACTION |
|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 12 DAYS
Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
September 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing: 12/11/18 Notice of Court Hearing Notice of OSC re Dismissal Hearing: 12/11/18 |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Grandsaert, John L. |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement of Entire Case | |
August 15, 2018 | Docket Event | ADR Mediation Scheduled | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ADR Evaluation Notice Sent | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Motion to Enforce 05/30/2018 Motion to Enforce Judge: Greenberg, Susan |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF PETER F. FINN IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE AND DIRECT COMP Declaration OF PETER F. FINN IN REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO ENFORCE AND DIRECT COMPLIANCE WITH DEPOSITION SUBPOENA FOR PRODUCTION OF BUSINESS RECORDS, ETC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.