We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.
Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hernandez Clarissa ,
filed a(n)
Automobile -
Torts
case
represented by
Law Offices Of George A Gallegos ,
against
Nunez Oscar ,
Perez Martin A ,
represented by
Donavan Monique Rachelle ,
Gates O'Doherty Gonter & Guy Llp ,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
.
Filing Date
March 18, 2016
Category
Auto (Limited Jurisdiction)
Last Refreshed
September 30, 2022
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Law Offices Of George A Gallegos
Attorneys for Defendants
Gates O'Doherty Gonter & Guy Llp
Other Parties
Gates O'Doherty Gonter & Guy Llp (Attorney For Unknown)
Case Events for
Hernandez Clarissa v. Nunez Oscar
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
October 18, 2017
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/18/2019 in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2017
October 18, 2017
Docket Event
Request for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
October 18, 2017
Docket Event
Request for Dismissal; Filed by: CLARISSA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff)
Get Document
October 18, 2017
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause re: (name extension) scheduled for 12/14/2017 in at Department 77 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/18/2017
September 29, 2017
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause re: re: Dismissal scheduled for 12/14/2017 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77
September 18, 2017
Docket Event
Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/18/2017; Filed by: Clerk
Get Document
September 18, 2017
Docket Event
Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/18/2017 in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77 updated: Result Date to 09/18/2017; Result Type to Held
September 18, 2017
Docket Event
Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
September 14, 2017
Docket Event
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by: CLARISSA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); Settlement Type: Conditional; Vacate Future Dates: No
Get Document
September 12, 2017
Docket Event
Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by: CLARISSA HERNANDEZ (Plaintiff); Settlement Type: Conditional; Vacate Future Dates: No
Get Document
See all events
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.