Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Slightom, Harold J filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Glusman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Case Cycle Time630 days |
Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order
Date: May 31, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 17, 2017Petition to Administer Estate
Date: December 20, 2016Petition Hearing
Date: January 17, 2017Notice of Petition to Administer Estate
Date: December 20, 2016Letters Issued
Date: January 17, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing - Final Discharge Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing Final Distribution Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
May 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Exparte Petition for Final Discharge and Order Ex Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order for Final Distribution and Allowance of Compensation to Attorneys for Ordinary Services Order for Final Distribution and Allowance of Compensation to Attorneys for Ordinary Services Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution Accounting Hearing First and Final Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account and Petition for Final Distribution Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Probate Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Granted Final discharge hearing date is 9/11/18 at 9:00am. The 7/10/18 hearing date is vacated. |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Account by Administrator by Starla Glassel Waiver of Account by Administrator |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Probate First and Final Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account Notice of Hearing - Probate First and Final Report of Administrator on Waiver of Account and Petition for Final Distribution |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Accounting, Report, Fees and Final Distribution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.