Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Richard M. Nystrom, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 04, 2016 |
CategoryTrust |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Document: Other | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition | |
May 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.