Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Maria Isabel Silva, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Monterey County. This case was filed in Monterey County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2016 |
CategoryConservatorship - Limited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationMonterey County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time1022 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Determination of Conservatee's Appropriate Level of Care | |
December 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Report: Investigator-1 year | |
September 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Letters (Initial): Issued/Filed | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration (Confidential ) | |
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Declaration (Confidential ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.