National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2 A Delaware Statutory Trust S,
filed a(n)
Collections -
Creditor
case
represented by
Kahn Michael D,
against
Rice Johnisha C,
Smith William A Aka Smith Sr William A,
in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County.
This case was filed in
Los Angeles County
Superior Courts
with Danielle R.A. Gibbons presiding.
Case Details for
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2 A Delaware Statutory Trust S v. Rice Johnisha C
, et al.
Case Events for
National Collegiate Student Loan Trust 2007-2 A Delaware Statutory Trust S v. Rice Johnisha C
, et al.
Date
Type
Description
December 03, 2020
Docket Event
Case reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Andrew C. Kim; Reason: Inventory Transfer
December 03, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y Not Held - Vacated by Court on
October 06, 2020
Docket Event
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk
October 06, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Norwalk Courthouse at Department Y
October 06, 2020
Hearing
Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service Filed by Clerk
January 10, 2019
Docket Event
in Department Y, Danielle R. A. Gibbons, Presiding Order to Show Cause - Hearing (Other) - Not Held - Vacated by Court
Judge: Danielle R. A. Gibbons
January 29, 2018
Docket Event
Case reassigned to Norwalk Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Andrew C. Kim; Reason: Reclassification
April 11, 2016
Docket Event
Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: (NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-2) A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIAM A SMITH (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 67.50; Service Cost Waived: No
April 11, 2016
Hearing
Proof of Service by Substituted Service Filed by (NATIONAL COLLEGIATE STUDENT LOAN TRUST 2007-2) A DELAWARE STATUTORY TRUST (S) (Plaintiff)
March 17, 2016
Docket Event
Case numbers NOR16N00396, and NOR16N00397 consolidated; case number NOR16N00396 is the lead case.