Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butte County Department Of Child Support Services filed a(n) Child Support - Family case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time538 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service by mail of minutes and Order After Hearing 6/19/2018 as to respondent and other parent |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Minutes and Order - DCSS
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
DCSS - OSC/MTN/RFO Initial DCSS NOM Re: Judgment, Child Support & Health Care; 05/17 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of NOM served on Respondent |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
RFO-OSC-MTN - Initial (DCSS Only) NOM Re: Judgment, Child Support & Health Care |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of NOM served on Other Parent |
|
January 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons Filed by Personal Service on 12/19/17 |
|
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer or Subsequent Paper to DCSS filing | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | DCSS Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.