Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Glander, Memoree, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Johnson, Lidia, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service By Mail 02-18-17 as to Respondent Regarding Restraining Order After Hearing |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO [Petitioner] Filed 01-13-17 Temps Granted Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires 02/08/2020 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service In Person 01-19-2017 as to Respondent Regarding Amended Notice of Hearing, Amended Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order, Amended Temporary Restraining Order |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Domestic Violence Temps Granted Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order
Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - DV/TRO Petitioner Filded 12-30-16 Temps Granted Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Req for Domestic Violence Rest Order- no Minor Children (NF) First Amended |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.