Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shy, Lorraine, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Shy, Stephen K, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDv Prevention W/O Minor Children |
Time To Trial63 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Cycle Time236 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
August 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorney Attorney to Pro Per |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Petitioner Filed 12-29-16 Temps Granted; [Petition] Filded First Amended 01-12-17 Temps Modified to Partially Granted TRO expires 03/24/17 Judge: Lucena, Kristen A |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation - No Fee Regarding Restraining Order Agreement |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Brief of Trial |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement of Contested Issues Contentions and Proposed Disposition, Witness List, and Exhibit List |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement of Contested Issues, Contentions, and Proposed Disposition; Witness List; Exhibit List |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Restraining Order After Hearing Expires: 3/24/17 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference Petitioner Filed 12-29-16 Temps Granted; [Petition] Filded First Amended 01-12-17 Temps Modified to Partially Granted TRO expires 03/24/17 1st TRAC Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.