Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Galagar, Melonie Joy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Royat, Gregory Lee, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Sandra L. McLean presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSandra L. McLean Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/ Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions252 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time396 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference 2ND Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment MSE Upon entry of judgment Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default - Uncontested | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Entered | |
August 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Income and Expense Declaration | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Preliminary |
|
June 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of the Status Conference served on Ms. Miller |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.