Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Huff, Shane L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Huff, Carrie, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with McNelis, Steven presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcNelis, Steven Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryDissolution W/O Minor Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time214 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling | |
July 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing sent to Petitioner |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
CRC 5.83 Status Conference - Initial
Judge: McNelis, Steven R |
|
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment MSE 6/25/17 Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
June 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Status Conference Statement | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on Communication -Judgment returned to the Petitioner Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default-Entered | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Declaration for Default - Uncontested | |
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Hearing - Predispo [Petitioner] Request for Hearing on Fee Waiver filed 01/24/17 Judge: McLean, Sandra L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.