Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Garcia, Daniel Ramon, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Gomez, Maria Elizabeth Flores, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with SARMIENTO, SALVADOR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSARMIENTO, SALVADOR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 08, 2016 |
CategoryCustody And / Or Visitation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Cycle Time35 days |
ORDER - FEE WAIVER HEARING 04/08/2016
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/08/2016
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00RESPONSE - CUSTODY & SUPPORT 04/22/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00DECLARATION 05/10/2016
Date: May 10, 2016PETITION - CUSTODY & SUPPORT MINOR CHILD 04/08/2016 Amount:$435.00
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 04/08/2016
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00AGREEMENT - FCS PARENTING 05/04/2016
Date: May 04, 2016SUMMONS - PARENTAGE / CUSTODY & SUPPORT 04/08/2016
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00MINUTE ORDER 05/13/2016
Date: May 13, 2016MINUTE ORDER 05/12/2016
Date: May 12, 2016ORDER - ATTEND FAMILY MEDIATION 04/25/2016
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/08/2016
Date: 2016-04-08T00:00:00INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 04/22/2016
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 04/22/2016
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 05/04/2016
Date: May 04, 2016RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION 04/25/2016 Amount:$60.00
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY JUDICIAL OFFICER 04/22/2016
Date: 2016-04-22T00:00:00NOTICE - RELATED CASE 04/25/2016
Date: 2016-04-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.