Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marvin Supapo, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by John Ward Schilt, against Chris Cao Nguyen, represented by Bruce Douglas Macleod, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited (16) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time249 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Settlement (atty: Schilt) |
|
August 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Clerk Rejection Letter Proof of Service of Summons- Document requires original signature or "by fax" on page |
|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer: Amended Complaint to 1st amended cmplt |
|
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Unavailability of Counsel/no fee | |
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Stipulation to stay action pending arbitration is GRANTED; the Case Management Conference on 4/18/17 is VACATED; A Case Status Review Hearing is set on 9/14/17 at 10:00AM, signed Judge Zayner. |
|
March 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
First Paper Filed - Fee Taken on stipulation to confirm arbitration and to stay the case. |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Amended first amended atty Schilt |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.