Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
California Department Of Motor Vehicles, filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case against Chris Woodrow, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with William J. Elfving presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam J. Elfving Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time64 days |
Minute Order
Date: March 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS OSC Re Contempt Heard 3-2-17 is Denied and the OSC is Discharged, Signed by Judge Elfving Judge: William J. Elfving |
|
March 02, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Re Contempt
Judge: Department 3 |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Responses to OSC by Def Christopher Woodrow (Donald A. Larkin ) 03/20/17 @9am in D3 Judge: William J. Elfving |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Service by mail |
|
February 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Christopher Woodrow in support of Response to OSC |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Mail Order to Show Cause Re Contempt |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration Of service by US mail. |
|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause RE: Contempt |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.