Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cynthia Mason, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Michael John Richter, against 361 California Avenue, Lp, Ehikian Company, The Counter Palo Alto Lp, represented by Jessica A Nudelman, Jose Anthony Montalvo, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore C. Zayner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited (35) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time228 days |
Minute Order
Date: April 26, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissal - Entire Action With prejudice |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice: Change Address/Firm Name change of firm name |
|
April 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 25, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Case Management
Judge: Department 6 |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Atty Richter |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 jury fee deposited |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Demand: Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.