Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vyachelsav Leizerovich, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brian J. Bickel, against American Honda Motor Company, represented by Margaret L. Sell, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time173 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS | |
June 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
April 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Change Address/Firm Name | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Errata to complaint for violation of the Song-Beverly Consumer Warranty Act |
|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Summons: Issued/Filed | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | New Filed Case | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.