Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nicolai Gvatua, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Amy-Lyn Morse, against Capitol Del Grande, Inc., Volkswagen Group Of America, Inc., represented by Michael Howard Steinberg, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management884 days |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 10, 2019Review: Case Status
Date: July 25, 2019Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: September 03, 2020Review: Case Status
Date: January 30, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 26, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 20 |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 30, 2020 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 20 |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF GREGORY A. LEHRMANN IN ANTICIPATION OF STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING | |
July 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Review: Case Status
Judge: Department 19 |
|
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice re: of Status Conference |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Status Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.