Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Walter Pena, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against John Comeau, Vivid, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited (16) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions36 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time936 days |
Minute Order
Date: July 19, 2018Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Complaint With Prejudice (Linda Keny) |
|
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 24, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Application and Order: Ex Parte Application to correct clerical error, by atty Keny. Signed by Judge Zayner |
|
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
November 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 13 |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Judge: Department 13 |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.