Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alesia Grandy, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Brian L. Larsen, against Victor Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore C. Zayner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Unlimited (22) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time504 days |
Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: May 15, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Arbitration: Other Action Voucher sent to finance |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 15, 2018 | Hearing |
Conference: Trial Setting
Judge: Department 6 |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal, Entire Action With Prejudice Request for Dismissal w/Prej (Larsen) |
|
April 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Case | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 18, 2018 | Hearing |
Review: Civil Early Settlement Conf Status
Judge: Department 6 |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
September 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 6 |
|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement: Case Management Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.