Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ubs Financial Services Inc., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Rachel A. Weitzman, against Anthony J.D. Feurtado, Shira Womack, represented by Anthony Kevin Reid, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Theodore C. Zayner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTheodore C. Zayner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions181 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time200 days |
Minute Order
Date: April 19, 2017Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice: Entry of Order | |
June 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS Motion for Discharge, atty's fees and costs is DENIED; The Complaint in Interpleader is Dismissed |
|
June 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 06, 2017 | Hearing | Motion: Order | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply to def's opp to mtn for discharge, costs & attys fees (Audette Paul Morales) hrg 6/6/17 9am D-6 Judge: Theodore C. Zayner |
|
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration: In Support of reply to def's opp to mtn for discharge, costs & attys fees (Audette Paul Morales) hrg 6/6/17 9am D-6 Judge: Theodore C. Zayner |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities in opposition to UBS's motion for discharge 6-6-17 9am dept.6 Judge: Theodore C. Zayner |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Def Shira Womack in opposition to UBS's motion to discharge |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Atty Anthony K. Reid in opposition to motion for discharge |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of atty D. Brad Jones in opposition to motion for discharge |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.