Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Debra Hathaway, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Daniel Joseph Marsh, Frank Reynolds Perrott, Julie Diane Mcelroy, Paul Bradley Walsh, Peter James Linn, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2016 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1131 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Case Cycle Time1279 days |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Debra Hathaway in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of Santa Clara. The case number is 16CV304365. Debra Hathaway is the plaintiff, and the defendant is Martin Ragno & Associates, Inc., ...
Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 05, 2018Complaint: Amendment To (New Party)
Date: August 05, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: September 19, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal partial with prejudice by atty Cochrane as to cross complaint filed 3-6-17 only |
|
June 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Approve Good Faith Settlement
Judge: Department 8 |
|
May 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice re: Withdrawl of Motion |
|
March 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Sever/Bifurcate Motion for Bifurcation. Hearing TBD |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Settlement Conference Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application - Notice Required for an OST on Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement by X-Def Corby Pools, Inc. (Julie D. McElroy) |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Good Faith Settlement HRG 03/24/2020 9am D8 Atty: McElroy Judge: Sunil R. Kulkarni |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Ex Parte for OST a Mtn for Determination of GFS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.