Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hung Quang Nguyen, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by James Lee Hand, against Ha Vinh Ly, Ha V Ly, Lap Thanh Tang, Vietnam Town Property, represented by Ismael Diaz Perez, Mark Whitney Lapham, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Sunil R. Kulkarni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSunil R. Kulkarni Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1570 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Hung Quang Nguyen against Lap Tang, Ha Ly, Vietnam Town Property LLC, and Does 1-50. The complaint alleges breach of contract and alter ego liability. According to the complaint, Hung Quang Nguyen made depo...
Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 22, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 18, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: June 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Motion to Compel to Require Defendant Lap Tang to Comply with the Court’s September 15, 2020 order and for Monetary Sanctions Plaintiff Hung Nguyen (“Plaintiff”)’s motion to require defendant Lap Tang...
Judge: WILLIAM J. MONAHAN |
|
September 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Department 8 |
|
September 03, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Judge: Department 8 |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee THIRD |
|
August 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Electronic | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter re: A) def Ly's Motion to Strike/Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; B) Plt'd Motion to File Third Amended Complaint; and C) Def Tang's Joinder to Motion to Strike See Order for Details Signed by Judge Kulkarni |
|
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Strike
Judge: Department 8 |
|
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 04, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Leave to File
Judge: Department 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.