Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Otey, Glen Robert, Jr., filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Rouse, Jillian, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
Category(43) Civil Harassment - No Fee |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
Case Cycle Time115 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Review Hearing ** Temps Granted in Part ** Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
April 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on request to continue hearing Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Granted in Part Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Attachments, Descriptions of Harassment, Exhibits, Notice of Court Hearing |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Order - Harassment Temps Granted in Part Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service re: restraining order, ntc of court hearing, etc |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing - Civil Harassment Temps Granted in Part Judge: Gunn, David E |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.