Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Orozco, Ernesto Alfredo, Tejeda, Alberto, filed a(n) (02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate case against Butte County Board Of Supervisors, Butte County Department Of Development Services, Lyde, D Marc, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management260 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
Category(02) Unlimited Writ Of Mandate |
|
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time260 days |
Case Management Conference
Date: September 15, 2017Petition - Writ for Review, Mandate or Prohibition
Date: December 29, 2016Letter(s) Submitted to Court
Date: February 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
August 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
May 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing change of address |
|
March 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Change of Address | |
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Declaration of Roger S. Wilson |
|
February 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter(s) Submitted to Court | |
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The petition is summarily denied for the reasons set forth in the County's preliminary opposition. |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.