Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hernandez, Christopher, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2016 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time183 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Status of Doe defendants Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
May 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order/Ruling Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling |
|
April 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dismissal after Sustaining Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint without Leave to Amend Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order/Ruling Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling on Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff Complaint |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order on Defendants' Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint Judge: Benson, Stephen E |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Demurrer Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The court grants the defendants' request for judicial notice of the documents and findings in PR00070 In re: Estate of Ehorn and that the plaintiff has no legal relationship to Darien Ehorn. The court finds that the plaintiff does not have standing to pursue a wrongful death action, or any associated claims, and therefore cannot state any causes of action. The demurrer is sustained without leave to amend. |
|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Reply to Defendants' Demurrer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.