Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Anzalone, Marie, filed a(n) Civil case against Baker, Kenneth, represented by Bowley, Gordon Wayne, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management183 days |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial634 days |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions624 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time659 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: June 09, 2017Order
Date: August 13, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: October 12, 2018Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: August 03, 2018Order
Date: September 07, 2018Order to Show Cause - Predisposition
Date: September 07, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 08, 2017Complaint
Date: December 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Continued from 8/17/2018 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference For Resetting of Trial Dates and Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4 Days, Joint Jury Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference 4 Days, Joint Jury Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Dismissing Action Order Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued as to Plaintiff, Marie Anzalone Order to Show Cause - Predisposition as to Plaintiff, Marie Anzalone for Failure to Appear for the Settlement Conference on August 3, 2018 Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Motion hearings - Predispo Attorney Belal Hamideh's Notice of Motion and Motion to be Relieved as Counsel Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling The court will hear the order to show cause against plaintiff Marie Anzalone for failure to appear at the settlement conference. If she does not appear, the court is inclined to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. If the case is not dismissed, the court finds there is insufficient notice under CCP Section 1005 as to plaintiff's counsel's motion to be relieved as counsel, but would be inclined to grant the motion if proper notice is given. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.