Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Beaver, Briana, Klein, Faelin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Dalrymple, Richard Henderson, Iii, against Simons, Dwight, Simons, Nona, represented by Peterson, Patricia Joan, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management183 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2016 |
Category(22) Unlimited Auto |
Time To Trial634 days |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Status Conference
Date: November 30, 2018Complaint
Date: December 22, 2016Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: April 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement; Conditional Status Conference Reported as settled, Dismissal to be filed Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 4 Days, Plaintiff Jury Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference 4 Days, Plaintiff Jury Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
August 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference
Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal/Conditional Request for Dismissal/Conditional |
|
July 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement; Conditional Conditional Settlement |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Case Management Conference Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.