Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The State Of California, Acting By And Through The State Public Works Board, filed a(n) Eminent Domain - Property case represented by Wong, Janet, against American Securities Company, A California Corporation, As Trustee, Gabrielian, David M., Gabrielian, Peter G., Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, A National Banking Association, represented by Brewer, Charles W., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Y. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management6 days |
Filing DateJune 29, 2016 |
Category14 Unlimited - Eminent Domain/Inverse Condemnation |
Time To Trial845 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions939 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEminent Domain |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time853 days |
Order Received for Signature
Date: November 09, 2016ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: October 12, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: November 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event | CRC 3.1385 After Settlement | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Not Entered Request for dismissal filed. Dismissal not entered as requested for the following reason: Stipulation & Judgment entered 12/03/2018 |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Recordation of Final Order |
|
January 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order filed Final Order of Condemnation |
|
December 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Received for Signature Final Order of Condemnation signed and issued. Forwarded to clerks office 1/07/2019, for further processing. Forwarded to: 501 Order for: Final Order of Condemnation |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing Correct Judgment - Alina Guzman Judge: Hamilton, Jeffrey Y. |
|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application Ex parte Filed for An Order Correcting the Judgment in Condemnation |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.