Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Clay, Rodney C, Hohenthaner, Lisa, filed a(n) Civil case against Hohenthaner, Lisa, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Robert A. Glusman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert A. Glusman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management172 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Time To Trial504 days |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time1129 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: September 04, 2018Statement
Date: May 15, 2017Declaration
Date: October 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling Case Management Conference Re Status of Settlement Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Reassignment
Judge: Glusman, Robert A |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Defendant/Cross-Complainant Lisa Hohenthaner's Motion to Enforce Settlement Status Conference Status of Settlement Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
|
October 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Mailing of Ruling on Defendant/Cross-Complaint Lisa Hohenthaner's Motion to Enforce Proof of Mailing |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support of Motion to Enforce Settlement Status Conference Continued from 09/21/2018 for Status of Settlement, Special Set to be Heard with Motion for Enforcement of Settlement Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
October 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Defendant/Cross-Complainant Lisa Hohenthaner's Motion to Enforce Settlement Ruling on Defendant/Cross-Complaint Lisa Hohenthaner's Motion to Enforce Settlement Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.