Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Smith, Kelsey, filed a(n) (42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) case represented by Rein, Steven, against Ever Bank, represented by Dykema Gossett, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management186 days |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
Category(42) Unlimited Other Complaint (Not Spec) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time347 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: May 23, 2016Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling
Date: July 05, 2016Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered
Date: November 30, 2016Notice of Settlement
Date: December 02, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: May 31, 2016Reply
Date: June 17, 2016Minute Order
Date: June 24, 2016Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: June 27, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: July 11, 2016Amended Complaint
Date: April 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal Entire Action - Entered with prejudice |
|
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer/Response - No Fee Amended Answer or Response - No Fee |
|
July 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Amended Complaint Second |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order/Ruling Notice of Entry of Judgment, Order or Ruling |
|
July 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Continued Case Management Conference | |
June 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part Without Prejudice as to Defendant Cal Western Reconveyance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.