Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chico Police Dept, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case against Houde, Matthew Donald, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management182 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2015 |
Category(43) Judicial Determination - Return Of Firearms (Wi 8102) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions182 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time196 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: May 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of "Request for Entry of Default on Petition Seeking Judicial Determination Regarding Return of Firearms and Order Thereon" | |
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default-Entered /Ordered |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Candela, Michael P |
|
June 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Management Conference |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL OF OFFICER STEVEN HOGUE IN SUPP OF PTN RE RETURN OF FIREARMS Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: CLL |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Declaration DECL SGT BRIAN MILLER SUPP PET RE RETURN FIREAR Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference NTC OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING NTC CMC Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.