Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Quall Cardot, against Adams, Brandie, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTamara L. Mosbarger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management1309 days |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2015 |
Category(09) Limited Rule 3.740 Collections - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1479 days |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time1479 days |
Case Management Statement
Date: May 23, 2019Complaint Filed - 30 Day Summons Issued - Under 10K
Date: December 16, 2015Request
Date: December 26, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: October 16, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: October 03, 2019Order to Show Cause - Predisposition
Date: January 08, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: June 17, 2019Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Date: October 16, 2019Request for Dismissal - Entered in Part
Date: March 20, 2017Order
Date: July 03, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Order to Show Cause as to Plaintiff's Counsel Quall Cardot - as to Sanctions Including Dismissal should not be Imposed for Failure to Prosecute Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment By Court
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request for Court Judgment Request |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Waiver of Security Interest Waiver |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Application for Entry of Default Judgment Pursuant to CCP 1788.60(a) Declaration |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Waiver of Interest in Excess of 10% Waiver |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration Regarding CCP 1033 Declaration |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Case Management Statement Case Management Conference Re Status of Default Judgment Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause - Court Issued
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Minutes Minute Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.