We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Ada County Highway District , Vs. Hannah Grow, Michael Prall .

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago

Ada County Highway District, filed a(n) Aa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1) case represented by Gourley, Kimbell David, against Grow, Hannah M, Prall, Michael E, in the jurisdiction of Ada County. This case was filed in Ada County Superior Courts with Cawthon (District), James S. presiding.

Case Details for Ada County Highway District v. Grow, Hannah M , et al.

Judge

Cawthon (District), James S.

Filing Date

August 01, 2023

Category

Aa- All Initial District Court Filings (Not E, F, And H1)

Last Refreshed

November 08, 2023

Filing Location

Ada County, ID

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for Ada County Highway District v. Grow, Hannah M , et al.

Plaintiffs

Ada County Highway District

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Gourley, Kimbell David

Defendants

Grow, Hannah M

Prall, Michael E

Case Events for Ada County Highway District v. Grow, Hannah M , et al.

Type Description
Bond Posted - Cash
Order
Judgment
Stipulation
for Judgment and Decree of Condemnation
Affidavit / Return of Service
08/04/23 - Co Resident
Affidavit / Return of Service
08/04/23 - Hannah Grow
Docket Event Lis Pendens
Docket Event New Case - District Civil
Docket Event Complaint Filed
Docket Event Civil Case Information Sheet
Docket Event Summons
See all events

Related Content in Ada County

Case

In the Matter of the Application of: Ethan Weick, For a Change of Name.
Jul 08, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A7- Name Change | A7- Name Change | CV01-24-11368

Case

1713 Curtis Boise LLC , vs. Pamela McNees .
Jul 11, 2024 | Haynes, Matthew | A12- Unlawful Detainer/Eviction | A12- Unlawful Detainer/Eviction | CV01-24-11613

Case

Alicia Barber Petitioner, vs. Christopher Zeise Respondent.
Jul 09, 2024 | Haynes, Matthew | A9- Child Support /Custody (Unless filed by DHW) | A9- Child Support /Custody (Unless filed by DHW) | CV01-24-11500

Case

Jeffrey Bunn Petitioner, vs. Jessica Bunn Respondent.
Jul 08, 2024 | Tollefson, Theodore | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | CV01-24-11429

Case

In the Matter of the Petition for Summary Administration of the Small Estate of: Kole Crofts
Jul 11, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | D- Summary Administration of Small Estates | D- Summary Administration of Small Estates | CV01-24-11619

Case

In the Matter of the Registration of Trust of: The Kerry S. Carnahan Trust.
Jul 11, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | H3- Registration of Trusts and Renunciations | H3- Registration of Trusts and Renunciations | CV01-24-11624

Case

In the Matter of the Petition for Summary Administration of the Small Estate of: Ryan Hutchinson
Jul 05, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | D- Summary Administration of Small Estates | D- Summary Administration of Small Estates | CV01-24-11504

Case

Stacy Eckel Petitioner, vs. William Yanez Respondent.
Jul 10, 2024 | McLennan, Michael | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | CV01-24-11623

Case

Marria Unser-Guzman Petitioner, vs. Gustavo Guzman Respondent.
Jul 10, 2024 | McLennan, Michael | B1a- Divorce With Minor Children | B1a- Divorce With Minor Children | CV01-24-11587

Case

Lvnv Funding Llc , vs. Samuel Mcdonald .
Jul 05, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11449

Case

Wells Fargo Bank NA , vs. Ivan Lomeli .
Jul 11, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11799

Case

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC , vs. James Bradbury .
Jul 08, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A18 Breach of Contract ($10,000 or less) | A18 Breach of Contract ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11508

Case

Suzanna Mercado Petitioner, vs. Tracy Mercado Respondent.
Jul 08, 2024 | Comstock, Danica | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | CV01-24-11406

Case

Kerby McMurtrie Petitioner, vs. Wesley McMurtrie Respondent.
Jul 08, 2024 | Tollefson, Theodore | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | CV01-24-11413

Case

Discover Bank , vs. Valerie Vass .
Jul 08, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11481

Case

Capital One NA , vs. Morgan Jara .
Jul 11, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11768

Case

Eddie Sanchez Petitioner, vs. Michael Knight Respondent.
Jul 11, 2024 | Haynes, Matthew | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | B1b- Divorce Without Minor Children | CV01-24-11612

Case

Four Site Property Management , vs. Stephanie Hendrickson .
Jul 09, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | A12- Unlawful Detainer/Eviction | A12- Unlawful Detainer/Eviction | CV01-24-11515

Case

State of Idaho, Department of Health and Welfare, Child Support Services Petitioner, vs. Michael Moore,Tera Dippi Respondent.
Jul 07, 2024 | Clerk, Magistrate Court | H2h- Child Support Proceedings Filed by DHW | H2h- Child Support Proceedings Filed by DHW | CV01-24-11400

Case

Danielle Pineo, Douglas Pineo , vs. Deping He .
Jul 10, 2024 | Strong, Adam | C -Small Claims | C -Small Claims | CV01-24-11610

Case

In the Matter of the Application of: Lora Gates, For a Change of Name.
Jul 08, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A7- Name Change | A7- Name Change | CV01-24-11403

Case

LVNV Funding LLC , vs. Joseph Sowell .
Jul 10, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11774

Case

LVNV Funding LLC , vs. Matiana Gutierrez .
Jul 10, 2024 | Dingeldein, Adam | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | A17 Creditor/ Debtor Collections ($10,000 or less) | CV01-24-11713

Case

Chantyll Hannaman Petitioner, vs. Jerimiah Ephraim Respondent.
Jul 12, 2024 | McLennan, Michael | B1a- Divorce With Minor Children | B1a- Divorce With Minor Children | CV01-24-11743

Case

Polly Peterson Petitioner, vs. Tyler Peterson Respondent.
Jul 09, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | B1a- Divorce With Minor Children | B1a- Divorce With Minor Children | CV01-24-11530