We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

In The Matter Of The Estate Of: Tyson Twilegar, Decedent.

Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago

Black Walnut Llc, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ada County. This case was filed in Ada County Superior Courts with Bieter, Christopher M. presiding.

Case Details for Black Walnut Llc v.

Judge

Bieter, Christopher M.

Filing Date

May 30, 2023

Category

A6- Application For Informal Probate

Last Refreshed

November 08, 2023

Practice Area

Probate

Filing Location

Ada County, ID

Matter Type

General Probate

Case Outcome Type

Judgment

Parties for Black Walnut Llc v.

Plaintiffs

Black Walnut Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Other Parties

Montgomery, Judson Brown (Attorney)

Twilegar, Tyson Alexander (Subject)

Case Events for Black Walnut Llc v.

Type Description
Claim Against Estate
(Mckinsey Lyon)
Claim Against Estate
(Child Support)
Docket Event Notice
of Claim Against Estate (Sasha Larson)
Docket Event Affidavit of Publication
Docket Event Claim Against Estate
Stoppello Law
Docket Event Claim Against Estate
Priority Administrative Claim Against Estate (Boise City)
Docket Event Information to Heirs and Devisees
Twilegar
Docket Event Letters of Administration
(1 Cert Emailed)
Docket Event Case Closed
Docket Event Statement-Informal Probate & Appoint Personal Representative
(Black Walnut LLC Appointed PR)
See all events

Related Content in Ada County

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Nevada Argyle, Decedent.
Jul 03, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11485

Case

In the Matter of the Registration of Trust of: The Lemuel E Chapin, MD and Nancy Chapin Marital Trust A dated August 5, 2005.
Jul 05, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | H3- Registration of Trusts and Renunciations | H3- Registration of Trusts and Renunciations | CV01-24-11335

Case

In the Matter of the Registration of Trust of: Revocable Trust for 324 Eagle Glen Lane Eagle ID.
Jul 08, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | H3- Registration of Trusts and Renunciations | H3- Registration of Trusts and Renunciations | CV01-24-11431

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Melissa Brodt, Decedent.
Jul 09, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11527

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Tomio Matsumoto, Decedent.
Jul 08, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11509

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Rita Lewis, Decedent.
Jul 03, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11489

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Kenneth Tower, Decedent.
Jul 05, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11497

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Mary Ray, Decedent.
Jul 07, 2024 | Jurries, Jill | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11499

Case

In the Matter of the Estate of: Robert Horton, Decedent.
Jul 03, 2024 | Alidjani, Fafa | A6- Application for Informal Probate | A6- Application for Informal Probate | CV01-24-11315

Ruling

Estate of Holder
Jul 11, 2024 | 23PB-0032276
ESTATE OF ANTHONY HOLDER Case Number: 23PB-0032276 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings to confirm the filing of the Inventory and Appraisal. The Final Inventory and Appraisal filed on June 13, 2024, is accepted by the Court. The Court notes the future court date of February 3, 2025, for Status of Administration. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

Guardianship of MADRIGAL, et al.
Jul 10, 2024 | CVPG20-0030814
GUARDIANSHIP OF AVERY AND ZADEN MADRIGAL Case Number: CVPG20-0030814 This matter is on calendar for further status on accounting. The matter was continued to allow the guardian to provide information regarding the status of the home equity loan. A report has been filed, but it does not address the issue raised by the court regarding refinancing at a fixed rate, rather than a variable rate. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to provide the Court with a further status.

Ruling

Guardianship of MADRIGAL, et al.
Jul 11, 2024 | CVPG20-0030814
GUARDIANSHIP OF AVERY AND ZADEN MADRIGAL Case Number: CVPG20-0030814 This matter is on calendar for further status on accounting. The matter was continued to allow the guardian to provide information regarding the status of the home equity loan. A report has been filed, but it does not address the issue raised by the court regarding refinancing at a fixed rate, rather than a variable rate. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to provide the Court with a further status.

Ruling

Conservatorship of Silva
Jul 11, 2024 | 24PC-0032309
CONSERVATORSHIP OF BRYCE SILVA Case Number: 24PC-0032309 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings to confirm filing of the Conservatorship Care Plan, and Determination of Appropriate Level of Care Form. The Conservatorship Care Plan and Determination of Appropriate Level of Care Form have not been filed. An appearance is necessary on today’s calendar to address the required documents. ESTATES

Ruling

In Re: ALICE TAYLOR 1998TRUST
Jul 11, 2024 | CVPB21-0031216
IN RE: ALICE TAYLOR 1998 TRUST Case Number: CVPB21-0031216 This matter is on calendar for status of settlement. A Status Report has been filed which indicates that additional time is needed to possibly resolve the matter. This matter is continued to Monday, October 7, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for status of settlement. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

Conservatorship of Alford
Jul 10, 2024 | 24PC-0032336
CONSERVATORSHIP OF JANET ALFORD Case Number: 24PC-0032336 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings to confirm the filing of the Inventory and Appraisal. No Inventory and Appraisal has been filed. A Status Report has been filed which requests additional time to provide the Inventory and Appraisal. This matter is continued to Monday, September 9, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for further proceedings to confirm filing of the Inventory and Appraisal. The Court notes the future date of March 24, 2025, for Annual Review. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

IN RE THE KAY J. LLOYD TRUST
Jul 11, 2024 | CVPB18-0029610
IN RE THE KAY J. LLOYD TRUST Case Number: CVPB18-0029610 This matter is on calendar for further proceedings on the Trust Petition. The Court was previously informed that the Petitioner Andrew Lloyd had passed away and that Counsel was seeking to probate his estate. The Court notes that the Estate of Andrew Lloyd is also on today’s calendar but will be continued to August 5,2024. This matter is continued to Monday, August 5, 2024, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for further proceedings on the Trust Petition. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Ruling

CONS OF ESTRADA
Jul 10, 2024 | CVPG99-0022044
CONSERVATORSHIP OF CARLOS ESTRADA Case Number: CVPG99-0022044 This matter is on calendar for hearing on the Thirteenth Account and Report of Conservator and Petition for Allowance of Fees. The matter has been properly noticed, with proof of service on file. No objections have been raised. The Petition is GRANTED. A proposed order was lodged with the Court and will be executed. The clerk is instructed to return the original accounting statements to counsel. This matter is set for Monday, February 23, 2026, at 2:30 p.m. in Department 44 for confirmation of filing of the Fourteenth Account. No appearance is necessary on today’s calendar.

Document

In the matter of: Howland, Virginia Grandi
May 13, 2024 | Estates and Administration | Late and Limited Formal Testacy and/or Appointment | PL24P1136EA

Document

In the matter of: Smiroldo, Sr., Joseph Neal
May 14, 2024 | Barbar, Hon. Thomas J | Estates and Administration | Informal Appointment of Personal Representative | MI24P2644EA

Document

Jocelyn Allery, Probate Document
Jul 02, 2024 | Open | Probate Document | Probate Document | 33-24-31

Document

In the matter of: Miaskiewicz, Theresa Elizabeth
May 15, 2024 | Yee, Hon. Michelle A | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | ES24P1441EA

Document

In the matter of: Eddy, Carleen L
Jun 04, 2024 | Black, Hon. Mary | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | ES24P1662EA

Document

In the matter of: Kulish, Stephen Matthew
May 28, 2024 | Estates and Administration | Voluntary Statement | PL24P1334EA

Document

In the matter of: Simopoulos, Aristotelis
Jun 11, 2024 | Anthony, Hon. Christine D. | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | MI24P3172EA

Document

In the matter of: Porter, Desiree L.
Jun 06, 2024 | Wyner, Hon. Claudine T. | Estates and Administration | Informal Probate of Will with Appointment of Personal Representative | HD24P1252EA