Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bleier, Elizabeth A, against Rasmussen, Peter Emil, represented by In Pro Per, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with SEXTON, ANDREA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSEXTON, ANDREA Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2016 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions95 days |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time654 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
LEVYING OFFICERS RETURN _______________________ CO ORIGINAL WRIT NOT RETURNED CCP 263.6 LEVYING OFFICERS RETURN LOS ANGELES CO ORIGINAL WRIT NOT RETURNED CCP 263.6 ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT, ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT, AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) | |
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ___________ COUNTY WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED LOS ANGELES COUNTY ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 194860 Date: 11/15/2016 |
|
May 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) Receipt: 188139 Date: 05/24/2016 | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CIVIL BY DEFAULT BY CLERK FOR PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $12917.53. ENTERED AS REQUESTED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION OF PLAITIFFS ATTORNEY REGARDING NONMILITARY STATUS ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT CLERKS JUDGEMENT ENTERED AS REQUESTED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OTHER: AS TO DOES 1 THROUGH 5 INCLUSIVE ONLY ENTERED AS REQUESTED ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DECLARATION PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 1033 (b) ELIZABETH A BLEIER (Attorney) on behalf of CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A (PLAINTIFF) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.