Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2015 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2023 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review: Investigator's Report
Judge: Judge Colleen Sterne |
|
August 13, 2020 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review of Court Investigator's Report The court has received and reviewed the report of the Court Investigator and it appears appropriate for approval absent objection. Review b...
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
August 08, 2019 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review of Conservator's Status Report
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
August 02, 2018 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Review of Court Investigator's Report The court has received and reviewed the report of the Court Investigator, and finds it appropriate for approval absent objection. The Publi...
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
April 13, 2017 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: 1st Accounting & Report of Conservator; Waiver of Future Accountings Approved, no appearance required.
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
September 15, 2016 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Compliance Review Hearing All requirements have been met. The matter is approved, no appearance required.
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
|
November 19, 2015 | Tentative Ruling |
Nature of Proceedings: Petition Appoint Conservator - Person and Estate When the parties were last in court on 10/22/15, counsel for proposed conservatee requested a continuance to allow for interview...
Judge: Colleen Sterne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.