Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robison, Johanna L, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Kazanjian, Debra presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKazanjian, Debra Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryGuardianship - Person Only |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
April 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplemental Court Investigation Report | |
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Confidential Court Investigation Report Fee wavied |
|
April 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Court Investigation Report Reciprocal done by Sacramento County |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Guardian Petition for Appointment of Guardian of the Person (Initial) Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
February 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Confidential Supplemental Court Investigation Report Report done by DSS per 1513 (b) |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Confidential Supplemental Court Investigation Report | |
January 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Objection to Guardianship |
|
January 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition - Appoint Temporary Guardian Petition for Appointment of Temporary Guardian of the Person Judge: Kazanjian, Debra |
|
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.