Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Fresno, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Gonzales, Gilbert, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Pebet, Noelle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePebet, Noelle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDafs |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Companion Case Calendared by Court per mo 01/11/2021- 20CEFL03042 Judge: Pebet, Noelle |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Party Served: Gilbert Gonzales on 12/16/19. | |
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment And Proof of Service By Mail: Anabelle Rivera was served |
|
June 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment And Proof of Service By Mail: Gilbert Gonzales was served |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint | |
December 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Filed Complaint Issued Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.