Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Breaud, Michael, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Breaud, Reyna, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Zepeda, Francine presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZepeda, Francine Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryDissolution - Minor Children |
Time To Trial276 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
2 Family - Centered Status Conference
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice regarding Payment of Support Substitution of Payee: DCSS |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Marital Status Ends: 11/18/2016 |
|
November 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Status-Only Judgment | |
October 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Declaration regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure Preliminary & final |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Commissioner Le Mon Minute Order. See attached. | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Companion Case Calendared by Court
Judge: Le Mon, Leanne |
|
October 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Ruling Spousal, Property, Retirement & Child Custody and Visitation Judge: Zepeda, Francine |
|
October 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Ruling Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.