Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Juarez, Jessika, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Martinez, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMcGuire, Rosemary Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryDomestic Violence With Children |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time71 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Reissued
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge McGuire Minute Order. See attached. Minute order from Dept: 304 at 9:00a.m. Judge R. McGuire Clerk: L. Luna Reporter: N. Duarte Nature of Hearing: Order to Show Cause, Child custody and visitation, Readiness Petitioner present/Sworn - pro per Respondent present/Sworn - attorney J. Trevino Court Interpreter, Pamela Warkintin, ASL, for petitioner/Respondent Other: Both parties are present in Court for a Domestic Violence Restraining Order. Both parties are being assisted by American Sign Language Interpreter Pamela Wartinkin. Ms. Juarez states that she has been scarred from incidents that transpired through all her pregnancies of her 3 children. Attorney Trevino on behalf of his client states that the medicine Ms. Juarez refused to give Mr. Martinez in one of the incidents, is very important for Mr. Martinez and not taking it could be life threatening. After hearing testimony from both parties, the Court finds that there is not sufficient evidence of past acts of abuse and Ms. Juarez has not met her burden of proof. Court will deny her request for a Restraining Order. The temporary Domestic Violence Restraining Order is terminated and the case is dismissed. Existing orders continue except as modified by this order. |
|
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
March 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Temporary Restraining Order | |
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Reissuance OSC/TRO Last Hearing: 2/11/2016 Reissued Hearing to: 3/10/2016 @ 9:30am Dept: 304 |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Reissued
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
February 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge McGuire Minute Order. See attached. Hrg: 2/11/2016 Time: 8:30 a.m. Dept: 304 Judge: R McGuire Clerk: L. Luna Reporter: N. Duarte Petitioner: Present Counsel: Pro Per Respondent: Present Counsel present: James Binion Hearing Type: Order to Show Other: TRO Reissue Interpreter: Court Pamela Warkentin Other: Sign Lang. (ASL) for Petitioner Continued to: 3/10/2016 Time: 9:30am Dept: 304 Issues: TRO DV Other: Parties are present at today's date. Ms. Jessika Suarez is being assisted by ASL Interpreter Pamela Warkentin. Attorney James Binion is present with Mr. Raymond Martinez. Attorney Binion is requesting a continuance to provide supporting documents to address issues that have risen today. Court grants the request and the matter will be continued. Temporary restraining order to remain in full force and effect. Existing orders remain in full force and effect. |
|
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Mail | |
February 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer to Temporary Restraining Order | |
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.